Multipliction || Easy Multiplicaton || Multiplication with lines || Easy Multiplication with drawing lines

For example how multiply the 34 x 21 with draw the lines ?

Figure 1: In the multiplication( 34 x 21 ), left side number (34), 3 is in tens and 4 is in ones place. From left to right, we draw red colour lines, first 3 (tens) lines and 4 (ones) lines shown above figure 1

Figure 1: In the multiplication( 34 x 21 ), right side number (21), 2 is tens and 1 is ones. From bottom to top, we draw lines first 2 (tens) green colour lines and 1 (ones) green colour lines touch with red colour lines shown above figure 2

Figure 3: After drawing red and green lines, they touch each two lines, Here we divide three joints(touch) above figure. from right side, we count the joints are 4, in the middle up and down we count the joints are 11. from left side the joints are 6

Figure-4 : In the middle we get 11. So tens place carries left side to add. finally in the middle 1 remaines. Left side already 6 is there and 1 add to this (comes from middle). Total 6 +1 = 7

Finally We get the answer (from left to right) 7 1 4

i.e. 34 x 21 = 714

Now you can practise some multiplications like this, any doubts leave your comments below only.

For example how multiply the 34 x 21 with draw the lines ?

Figure 1: In the multiplication( 34 x 21 ), left side number (34), 3 is in tens and 4 is in ones place. From left to right, we draw red colour lines, first 3 (tens) lines and 4 (ones) lines shown above figure 1

Figure 1: In the multiplication( 34 x 21 ), right side number (21), 2 is tens and 1 is ones. From bottom to top, we draw lines first 2 (tens) green colour lines and 1 (ones) green colour lines touch with red colour lines shown above figure 2

Figure 3: After drawing red and green lines, they touch each two lines, Here we divide three joints(touch) above figure. from right side, we count the joints are 4, in the middle up and down we count the joints are 11. from left side the joints are 6

Figure-4 : In the middle we get 11. So tens place carries left side to add. finally in the middle 1 remaines. Left side already 6 is there and 1 add to this (comes from middle). Total 6 +1 = 7

Finally We get the answer (from left to right) 7 1 4

i.e. 34 x 21 = 714

Now you can practise some multiplications like this, any doubts leave your comments below only.

## 0 comments:

## Post a Comment